CT HB05377 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To remove COVID-19 related layoffs from the unemployment experience account.
Title
An Act Concerning The Removal Of Covid-19 Related Layoffs From The Unemployment Compensation Experience Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 107 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 55 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 55 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Public Act 21-5 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 354 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2021-04-26 | House | House Passed |
2021-04-06 | House | File Number 254 |
2021-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 208 |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2021-03-16 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-04 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |