CT HB05417 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - File Number 367
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - File Number 367
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require local and regional boards of education to state a reason for removing or restricting access to public school library materials and prohibiting such boards from removing or restricting access to such materials for certain reasons.
Title
An Act Concerning Public School Libraries.
Sponsors
House Education Committee | Rep. Christopher Rosario [D] | Rep. Susan Johnson [D] | Sen. Martha Marx [D] |
Rep. Anthony Nolan [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | File Number 367 |
2024-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 242 |
2024-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |