CT HB06034 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) expand the Project Longevity Initiative to the city of Waterbury, and (2) require the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management to create a plan to implement the initiative on a state-wide basis.
Title
An Act Concerning Project Longevity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 452 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 207 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 207 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-24 | House | Public Act 21-153 |
2021-06-09 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | House | Senate Passed |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 523 |
2021-05-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-26 | House | House Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | File Number 379 |
2021-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 292 |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2021-03-19 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2021-02-05 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |