CT HB06482 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide funding for bikeways, trails and greenways.
Title
An Act Authorizing Bonding For Bikeways, Greenways And Recreational Trails.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2023-03-08 | House | File Number 37 |
2023-03-08 | House | House Calendar Number 48 |
2023-03-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/23 5:00 PM |
2023-02-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-02-17 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing 01/30 |
2023-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |