CT HB06519 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Senate Calendar Number 410
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Senate Calendar Number 410
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To collect data on malnutrition risks for senior citizens and ensure that they have adequate nutritional assistance.
Title
An Act Concerning Data Collection To Prevent Malnutrition Among Senior Citizens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 80 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Senate Calendar Number 410 |
2021-05-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-06 | House | House Passed |
2021-04-19 | House | File Number 502 |
2021-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 369 |
2021-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |