CT HB06534 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require public and nonpublic schools to develop and implement emergency action plans for responding to serious and life-threatening sports-related injuries that occur during interscholastic and intramural athletic events.
Title
An Act Concerning Emergency Action Plans For Interscholastic And Intramural Athletic Events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 369 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 154 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 154 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-16 | House | Public Act 21-92 |
2021-06-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2021-05-21 | House | Senate Calendar Number 470 |
2021-05-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-19 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2021-05-19 | House | House Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | File Number 243 |
2021-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 204 |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |