CT HB06558 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-01 - Senate Calendar Number 574
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-01 - Senate Calendar Number 574
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize municipalities to abate up to five hundred dollars per assessment year of property taxes for certain first-time homebuyers who obtain a loan from the Connecticut Housing Finance Authority.
Title
An Act Concerning Property Tax Abatement For Certain First-time Home Buyers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 196 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 574 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-30 | House | House Passed |
2023-03-21 | House | File Number 129 |
2023-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 101 |
2023-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-01-27 | House | Public Hearing 02/01 |
2023-01-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |