CT HB06599 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit discrimination in various contexts on the basis of gender identity or expression.
Title
An Act Concerning Discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 377 PASS (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 376 ADOPT SENATE AMD E LCO 7378 (Y: 8 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 375 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 7440 (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 374 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 6901 (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 373 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 6899 (Y: 16 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 372 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 6902 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 157 AS AMENDED (Y: 76 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 156 LCO # 6533 (Y: 46 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2011-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 155 LCO # 6516 (Y: 60 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2011-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 376 ADOPT SENATE AMD E LCO 7378 (Y: 8 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 375 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 7440 (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 374 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 6901 (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 373 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 6899 (Y: 16 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 372 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 6902 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 157 AS AMENDED (Y: 76 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 156 LCO # 6533 (Y: 46 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2011-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 155 LCO # 6516 (Y: 60 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-16 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-14 | Public Act 11-55 | |
2011-06-03 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-03 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-03 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 7378 | |
2011-06-03 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 7440 | |
2011-06-03 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 6901 | |
2011-06-03 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 6899 | |
2011-06-03 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 6902 | |
2011-06-03 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-23 | File Number 838 | |
2011-05-23 | Senate Calendar Number 545 | |
2011-05-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-19 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-19 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 6533 | |
2011-05-19 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 6516 | |
2011-05-19 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6685 | |
2011-04-21 | File Number 617 | |
2011-04-21 | House Calendar Number 361 | |
2011-04-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-21 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-15 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-06 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-05 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-17 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |