CT HB06801 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - File Number 883
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - File Number 883
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To conduct a study of small business lending in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Crowdfunding, Prohibited Acts Of Mortgage Servicers, Small Business Lending, Alternative Forms Of Identification For Opening Bank Accounts, Reverse Mortgages, Disclosures For Prepaid Cards, Successors In Interest In Foreclosed Property And The Prevention Of Fraud In Deposit Accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 175 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | File Number 883 |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 573 |
2015-05-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7588 |
2015-04-29 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-29 | House | No New File by Committee on Commerce |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Commerce |
2015-04-21 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-21 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-23 | House | File Number 178 |
2015-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 124 |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |