CT HB06905 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - File Number 625
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - File Number 625
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require entities to annually certify whether they have an official policy of refusing to dispense, sell or distribute certain pharmaceuticals in other states and to prohibit state and quasi-public agencies and municipalities from entering into a contract with any entity that has such a policy unless based upon a supported claim that such dispensing, sale or distribution is illegal in a state.
Title
An Act Concerning State Contracting And The Dispensing, Sale And Distribution Of Certain Pharmaceuticals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | File Number 625 |
2023-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 410 |
2023-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |