CT HB06923 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-30 - File Number 921
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-30 - File Number 921
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide greater protections for victims of sexual assault by enhancing privacy protections concerning court proceedings and records and to provide for deadlines concerning the transfer of and analysis of rape kit evidence.
Title
An Act Concerning Dna Testing For Persons Arraigned For A Serious Felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 267 AS AMENDED (Y: 127 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-30 | Senate | File Number 921 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 624 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2015-05-29 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-29 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8284 |
2015-04-16 | House | File Number 680 |
2015-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 443 |
2015-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-27 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |