CT HB06933 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 477
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 477
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Labor Commissioner to study whether employers in this state should be required to disclose to job applicants the salary ranges for advertised vacant employment positions.
Title
An Act Requiring Disclosure Of The Salary Range Of A Vacant Employment Position.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | File Number 477 |
2019-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 302 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-03-18 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2019-02-14 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |