CT HB07273 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - Senate Calendar Number 607
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - Senate Calendar Number 607
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Department of Education to study issues relating to local education authorities in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Local Education Authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 359 AS AMENDED (Y: 127 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 607 |
2017-06-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-06 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-06 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C |
2017-06-06 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 8807 |
2017-06-06 | House | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 8803 |
2017-06-06 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8759 |
2017-04-06 | House | File Number 463 |
2017-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 324 |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |