CT HR00005 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-12 - File Number 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-12 - File Number 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Approving The Stipulation Of The Settlement In Ralph Birch V. Town Of New Milford, Et Al. And Shawn Henning V. Town Of New Milford, Et Al.
Title
Resolution Approving The Stipulation Of The Settlement In Ralph Birch V. Town Of New Milford, Et Al. And Shawn Henning V. Town Of New Milford, Et Al.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | File Number 6 |
2024-03-12 | House | House Calendar Number 27 |
2024-03-12 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable Report, House Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-01 | House | House Favorable |
2024-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-22 | House | Filed with House Clerks 02/20 |