CT SB00134 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To expand workers' compensation coverage to individuals suffering from a severe mental or emotional impairment as a direct result of witnessing the death or maiming of another human being whose death or maiming was caused by an act of violence of another human being.
Title
An Act Concerning Workers' Compensation Coverage For Police Officers And Firefighters Who Are Diagnosed With Post-traumatic Stress Disorder.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-15 | Senate | File Number 52 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 91 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |