CT SB00182 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-13 - File Number 20
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-13 - File Number 20
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit certain health carriers from requiring step therapy for prescription drugs used to treat a mental or behavioral health condition or a chronic, disabling or life-threatening condition.
Title
An Act Prohibiting Certain Health Carriers From Requiring Step Therapy For Prescription Drugs Used To Treat A Mental Or Behavioral Health Condition Or A Chronic, Disabling Or Life-threatening Condition.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Sen. Jeff Gordon [R] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] |
Rep. Gary Turco [D] | Rep. Anne Hughes [D] | Rep. Amy Morrin Bello [D] | Sen. Derek Slap [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | File Number 20 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 45 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |