CT SB00186 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To expand the membership of the Connecticut Medical Examining Board; increase the number of continuing medical education credits for physicians; require renewal of physician, nurse and dentist licenses using the Department of Public Health's on-line license renewal system; and change the membership of the Connecticut State Board of Examiners for Nursing.
Title
An Act Concerning The Licensing, Investigation And Disciplinary Processes For Physicians And Nurses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 245 AS AMENDED (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 147 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 147 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-18 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-15 | Public Act 12-62 | |
2012-05-05 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-05 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-05 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-20 | House Calendar Number 415 | |
2012-04-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-18 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3223 | |
2012-04-05 | File Number 270 | |
2012-04-05 | Senate Calendar Number 232 | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-05 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-30 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-23 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-09 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | |
2012-02-29 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |