CT SB00200 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - House Calendar Number 400
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - House Calendar Number 400
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) make technical corrections regarding the Local Capital Improvement Program statutes; (2) modify requirements concerning the process by which elderly and totally disabled renters apply for a grant in refund of utility and rent bills so as to reflect the use of an automated application system consistent with current practice; and (3) make a technical correction regarding an incorrect reference in the statute governing claimant appeals for tax relief and renters' rebate programs.
Title
An Act Concerning Technical And Conforming Changes To Certain Property Tax Relief And Municipal Grant Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 165 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | House Calendar Number 400 | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-21 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-14 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-04-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-14 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-08 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-04-01 | File Number 243 | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Calendar Number 188 | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-01 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-26 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-17 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-02-23 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |