CT SB00200 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require a study of issues concerning higher education.
Title
An Act Concerning The Butler School And The Sawyer School.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D] | Sen. Andres Ayala [D] | Rep. Robert Sanchez [D] |
Rep. Theresa Conroy [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 51 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 15 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 15 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-03-14 | House | Public Act 13-1 |
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by Governor in Original |
2013-03-06 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2013-03-06 | House | In Concurrence |
2013-03-06 | House | House Passed |
2013-03-06 | House | Rules Suspended |
2013-03-06 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | File Number 8 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 42 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/25/13 5:00 PM |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |