CT SB00200 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-09 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-09 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To expand health insurance coverage for specialized formula from children up to age twelve to individuals up to age twenty-six.
Title
An Act Expanding Health Insurance Coverage Of Specialized Formula For Individuals With Eosinophilic Gastrointestinal Disorders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-31 | Senate | File Number 187 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 162 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |