CT SB00200 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - File Number 71
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - File Number 71
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the removal of Internet records or identifying information concerning summary process actions after the disposition of such actions.
Title
An Act Concerning Summary Process Records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | File Number 71 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 85 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |