CT SB00200 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a task force to study consumer protection measures in this state.
Title
An Act Concerning Social Equity Applicants, Infused Beverages And Moderate-thc Hemp Products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 285 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 251 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 251 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Public Act 24-95 |
2024-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2024-05-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2024-05-08 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-08 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-08 | House | Rules Suspended |
2024-05-08 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5899 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | File Number 73 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 73 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |