CT SB00275 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require that at least fifty per cent of teachers in a program accepting school readiness funds have either a bachelor's degree from an accredited institution of higher education or a teaching certificate with an early childhood education endorsement by 2015.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recommendations By The Legislative Commissioners For Technical Revisions To The Education Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 131 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-17 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-12 | Public Act 10-71 | |
2010-05-04 | In Concurrence | |
2010-05-04 | House Passed | |
2010-04-22 | House Calendar Number 416 | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-21 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-07 | File Number 343 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Calendar Number 222 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-31 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-19 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |