CT SB00301 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - File Number 345
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - File Number 345
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) update state energy and water efficiency standards for appliances and other equipment, and (2) expand the Housing Environmental Improvement Revolving Loan and Grant Fund to include a grant program and adjust the bonding authorization for this program.
Title
An Act Concerning Energy Efficiency Standards And Grants For Retrofitting Projects.
Sponsors
House Energy and Technology Committee | Sen. Julie Kushner [D] | Rep. Brandon Chafee [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Rep. Anne Hughes [D] | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | File Number 345 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 232 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |