CT SB00323 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow residential care homes to recover costs incurred for minor repair, maintenance and improvements over a period that more closely reflects common asset-based bank loans of five years.
Title
An Act Concerning Capital Expenditures At Residential Care Homes.
Sponsors
House Human Services Committee | Rep. Elizabeth Boukus [D] | Rep. Brandon McGee [D] | Rep. Charlie Stallworth [D] |
Sen. Carlo Leone [D] | Sen. Catherine Osten [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 201 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 139 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 139 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Public Act 14-30 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-01 | Senate | House Passed |
2014-04-24 | Senate | House Calendar Number 444 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-04-16 | Senate | File Number 566 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 375 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |