CT SB00605 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - Bill Placed on Senate Agenda, Senate Agenda Never Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - Bill Placed on Senate Agenda, Senate Agenda Never Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a moratorium on the construction of a maintenance garage, concession stand, viewing stand, entrance booth and other related construction projects at Silver Sands State Park in Milford until the local legislative body approves of such project or projects.
Title
An Act Requiring Local Approval Of Certain Construction Projects At Silver Sands State Park.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 392 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 122 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 393 AS AMENDED (Y: 89 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 228 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 393 AS AMENDED (Y: 89 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 228 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | Bill Placed on Senate Agenda, Senate Agenda Never Adopted |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8988 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 8916 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House Calendar Number 594 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6805 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | File Number 436 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 231 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |