CT SB00881 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - House Calendar Number 589
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - House Calendar Number 589
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Workforce Development.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D] | Sen. Tony Hwang [R] | Sen. Joan Hartley [D] | Sen. James Maroney [D] |
Sen. Paul Cicarella [R] | Sen. Henri Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 299 (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 300 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 300 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Calendar Number 589 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 9377 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 9807 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-01 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9435 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | File Number 679 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | New File by Committee on Education |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/11/21 5:00 PM |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education |
2021-04-08 | Senate | File Number 327 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 227 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |