CT SB00892 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make minor changes to (1) the process of appointments, reviews and evaluations by the Criminal Justice Commission including concerning the appointment of the Inspector General, (2) the membership of the Division of Criminal Justice Advisory Board, and (3) the process by which use of force by a peace officer is investigated.
Title
An Act Concerning The Criminal Justice Commission, Division Of Criminal Justice And The Office Of The Inspector General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 57 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 100 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 100 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Public Act 21-8 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-05-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 445 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | File Number 486 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 290 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |