CT SB00925 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-05 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-05 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To change the membership and responsibilities of the Bradley Board of Directors.
Title
An Act Concerning Bradley International Airport And Economic Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-27 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-27 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-21 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-07 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-06 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-06 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-01 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-03-23 | File Number 164 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Calendar Number 133 | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-23 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-09 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-08 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing 02/17 | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |