CT SB00925 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To extend workers' compensation benefits to firefighters and police officers who suffer a cardiac emergency resulting in death or temporary or permanent total or partial disability within seventy-two hours of engaging in certain public safety operations.
Title
An Act Concerning Workers' Compensation Coverage For Firefighters And Police Officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-01 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5976 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | File Number 189 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 193 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |