CT SB00952 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning A Second Chance Society.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 398 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 397 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 9318 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 397 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 9318 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Bill Passed Temporarily |
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Calendar Number 688 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9318 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | File Number 748 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 441 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/15 10:00 AM |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |