CT SB00981 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit the Commissioner of Children and Families from placing children under the age of six, or sibling groups with a child under the age of six, in congregate care facilities unless necessary for health reasons.
Title
An Act Concerning The Placement Of Young Children In Congregate Care Facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |
2011-03-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-04 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-03 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services | |
2011-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |