CT SB01005 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - House Calendar Number 360
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - House Calendar Number 360
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require certain health insurers to automatically provide health insurance coverage for certain newborns.
Title
An Act Concerning Required Health Insurance Coverage For Newborn Children.
Sponsors
House Insurance and Real Estate Committee | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Sen. Gary Winfield [D] | Sen. Matthew Lesser [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 83 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | House Calendar Number 360 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | File Number 324 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 209 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |