CT SB01102 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Authorize (A) pharmacists to administer additional vaccines, tests and drugs, and (B) pharmacies to operate mobile pharmacies; and (2) provide that an institutional pharmacy located in a licensed health care facility may compound sterile pharmaceuticals.
Title
An Act Concerning Pharmacies And Pharmacists.
Sponsors
House General Law Committee | Sen. Ryan Fazio [D] | Sen. Patricia Miller [D] | Rep. William Pizzuto [R] |
Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Rep. Hubert Delany [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 189 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 139 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 139 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Public Act 23-19 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-05-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-30 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-05 | House | House Calendar Number 493 |
2023-05-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7349 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | File Number 221 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 150 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |