CT SB01150 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-17 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-17 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the risk-limiting audits working group.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Risk-limiting Audits Working Group.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-17 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-04-17 | Senate | File Number 606 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 356 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |