DC B21-0021 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, the bill raises the dollar amount of fines levied on drivers for distracted driving, and provides that three violations within 18 months will result in a suspended license.
Title
Enhanced Penalties For Distracted Driving Amendment Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - Amendment #1 (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - Amendment #2 (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - Amendment #1 (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - Amendment #2 (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017 |
2016-12-09 | Council | Act A21-0552 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15027 |
2016-12-06 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0552 |
2016-12-06 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0552 |
2016-11-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 6, 2016 |
2016-11-01 | Council | Amendment #2 (Mendelson) |
2016-11-01 | Council | Amendment #1 (Mendelson) |
2016-11-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-10-11 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-10-04 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-10-03 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0021 |
2015-12-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2015-10-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-01-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0021 Published in the DC Register |
2015-01-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2015-01-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |