DC B21-0210 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides access to medical marijuana in the District of Columbia to those patients enrolled in a medical marijuana program from other jurisdictions. The patients must be undergoing a qualifying medical treatment or possess a valid medical marijuana card from their home jurisdiction. It increases the plant count limit from 500 to 1000 in dispensaries. It establishes requirements for the relocation and change in ownership of dispensaries, cultivation centers, and testing laboratories. It expands what health professionals may recommend medical marijuana to a list of authorized practitioners.
Title
Medical Marijuana Reciprocity Amendment Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - Amendment #2 (Grosso) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson & Alexander) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - Amendment #1 (Grosso) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - Amendment #2 (Alexander) - Not Considered (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - Amendment (Grosso) (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-10-11 - Council - Amendment #1 (Alexander) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - Amendment #2 (Grosso) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson & Alexander) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - Amendment #1 (Grosso) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - Amendment #2 (Alexander) - Not Considered (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - Amendment (Grosso) (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-10-11 - Council - Amendment #1 (Alexander) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017 |
2016-12-16 | Council | Act A21-0565 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15291 |
2016-12-07 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0565 |
2016-12-07 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0565 |
2016-11-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 8, 2016 |
2016-11-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-11-01 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson & Alexander) |
2016-11-01 | Council | Amendment #2 (Grosso) |
2016-11-01 | Council | Amendment #1 (Grosso) |
2016-10-11 | Council | Amendment #1 (Alexander) |
2016-10-11 | Council | Amendment (Grosso) |
2016-10-11 | Council | First Reading |
2016-10-11 | Council | Amendment #2 (Alexander) - Not Considered |
2016-09-22 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-09-22 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0210 |
2016-03-24 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-03-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0210 |
2015-07-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2015-06-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-06-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0210 Published in the DC Register |
2015-06-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-05-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |