DC B21-0403 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill extends the validity of a learner's permit to two years from one year and makes technical changes to the law concerning junk vehicles.
Title
Department Of Motor Vehicles Reform Amendment Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017 |
2016-12-09 | Council | Act A21-0546 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15007 |
2016-11-29 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0546 |
2016-11-29 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0546 |
2016-11-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 30, 2016 |
2016-11-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-10-11 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-10-04 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-10-03 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0403 |
2016-06-09 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-05-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-10-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2015-10-02 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0403 Published in the DC Register |
2015-09-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |