DC B21-0708 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to include the phrase 'End Taxation without Representation" to the standard motor vehicle tag. It also requires the Mayor to design and produce a motor vehicle identification tag with the phrase "We Demand Statehood", and authorizes the Mayor to establish application and display fees. The fees collected will be deposited into the New Columbia Statehood Fund.
Title
End Taxation Without Representation Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-20 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017 |
2016-12-20 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-12-13 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-12-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0708 |
2016-12-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-10-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-10-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0708 |
2016-09-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-09-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-04-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0708 Published in the DC Register |
2016-04-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2016-04-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |