DC B21-0780 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill prohibits the smoking of electronic cigarettes in all areas where smoking is currently prohibited by law, including public spaces and places of employment.
Title
Electronic Cigarette Parity Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Cnc. Yvette Alexander [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017 |
2016-11-25 | Council | Act A21-0543 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14370 |
2016-11-18 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0543 |
2016-11-18 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0543 |
2016-11-04 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 21, 2016 |
2016-11-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-10-11 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-09-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-09-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0780 |
2016-07-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-06-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-06-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0780 Published in the DC Register |
2016-06-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-06-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |