DC B21-0936 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Georgia Avenue Retail Priority Area Temporary Amendment Act Of 2016
Title
Georgia Avenue Retail Priority Area Temporary Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-15 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017 |
2016-12-23 | Council | Act A21-0579 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15713 |
2016-12-19 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0579 |
2016-12-19 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0579 |
2016-12-05 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 19, 2016 |
2016-11-15 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-11-15 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-11-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0936 Published in the DC Register |
2016-11-01 | Council | First Reading |
2016-11-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |