DC B21-0967 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-09 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 25, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-09 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 25, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
At-risk Tenant Protection Clarifying Temporary Amendment Act Of 2016
Title
At-risk Tenant Protection Clarifying Temporary Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-20 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 25, 2017 |
2016-12-20 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-12-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-12-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0967 Published in the DC Register |
2016-12-06 | Council | First Reading |
2016-12-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |