DC B24-0429 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-20 - Final Reading, CC
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-20 - Final Reading, CC
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-429 would establish the District Resident Transit Subsidy Program and excludes subsidies provided pursuant to this program from gross income. Subsidies would be applicable to eligible students, foster youth, summery youth employees and adult learners.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see Fiscal Impact Statement for more information.
Title
Metro for D.C. Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-12-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-12-06 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-12-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0429 |
2022-09-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-09-27 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-09-26 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0429 |
2022-09-08 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-02-23 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-01-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-01-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0429 Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2021-10-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |