DC B24-0654 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-13 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-13 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Wizards Motor Vehicle Identification Tags Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Washington Wizards Motor Vehicle Identification Tags Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-06-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-02-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0654 Published in the DC Register |
2022-02-15 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2022-02-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0654 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/48771/Introduction/B24-0654-Introduction.pdf |