DC B24-1110 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-20 - Final Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-20 - Final Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Comprehensive Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Access, Readiness, and Sustainability Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Comprehensive Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Access, Readiness, and Sustainability Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-12-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2022-12-02 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-1110 Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |