DC B25-0743 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-17 - Agendized; not considered at the request of NOT CONSIDERED (Chairman Mendelson)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-17 - Agendized; not considered at the request of NOT CONSIDERED (Chairman Mendelson)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-743 would symbolically designate a portion of the public alley system in Square 197 abutting Lots 841, 820, and 88, as Alexi Navalny Way.
Title
Alexei Navalny Way Designation Act of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-17 | Council | Agendized; not considered at the request of NOT CONSIDERED (Chairman Mendelson) |
2024-07-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-06-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0743 Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0743 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54939/Introduction/B25-0743-Introduction.pdf |