DC PR24-0963 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-29 - Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-29 - Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Building Energy Performance Standards Program Infractions Resolution of 2022
Title
Building Energy Performance Standards Program Infractions Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-29 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-11-28 | Council | Notice of Mark-up Cancellation filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-10-28 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-10-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0963 Published in the DC Register |
2022-10-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2022-09-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR24-0963 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/51375/Introduction/PR24-0963-Introduction.pdf |