DC PR24-1067 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority Board of Directors Michele Hagans Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Title
Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority Board of Directors Michele Hagans Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-12-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2022-12-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-12-02 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-1067 Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR24-1067 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/51708/Introduction/PR24-1067-Introduction.pdf |