DC PR25-0639 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Resolution R25-0494, Effective from May 07, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 006128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Resolution R25-0494, Effective from May 07, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 006128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rental Housing Commission Mr. Adam R. Hunter Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Title
Rental Housing Commission Mr. Adam R. Hunter Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Council | Resolution R25-0494, Effective from May 07, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 006128 |
2024-05-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0494 |
2024-05-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-04-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-04-22 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0639 |
2024-04-22 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2024-03-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-03-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-03-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing |
2024-02-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0639 Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |