DC PR25-0748 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Resolution R25-0496, Effective from May 07, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 006130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Resolution R25-0496, Effective from May 07, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 006130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. NFPHC-OPS-23-C-00059 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and Morrison Management Specialists, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
Contract No. NFPHC-OPS-23-C-00059 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and Morrison Management Specialists, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Council | Resolution R25-0496, Effective from May 07, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 006130 |
2024-05-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0496 |
2024-05-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-05-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-05-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |